HI HB1208 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution to repeal the exclusive power of the counties as to the functions, powers, and duties relating to the taxation of real property and authorize the State to also exercise those functions, powers, and duties. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing An Amendment To Article Viii, Section 3 Of The Hawaii Constitution Relating To The Functions, Powers, And Duties Of Real Property Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-10-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback