HI HB1206 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Initiates reporting requirements and safeguards to prevent anti-competitive practices in the meat processing industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Food Security.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB692 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback