HI HB1202 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, regulates, and taxes cannabis and manufactured cannabis products for responsible, adult use. Exempts sales of cannabis and manufactured cannabis products for medical use from the general excise tax. Clarifies that qualifying out-of-state patients have the same rights and privileges under the medical cannabis law. Allows qualifying out-of-state patients to cultivate medical cannabis.
Title
Relating To Cannabis.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1376 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1202 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1202 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1202&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1202_.HTM |