HI HB1199 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to adopt and implement a written policy on domestic violence committed or allegedly committed by a law enforcement officer. Establishes standards, training deadlines, administrative procedures, and reporting requirements.
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1199&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1199_.HTM |