HI HB1184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL/TRE.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL/TRE.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces criminal penalties for certain airport offenses addressed in Chapter 261, Hawaii Revised Statutes, or in certain administrative rules or orders issued pursuant thereto, with a civil penalty. (HB1184 HD1)
Title
Relating To Aeronautics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL/TRE. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 326). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-01-17 12:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1184 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL/TRE.
SB1163 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:00PM in conference room 325.
SB1163 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:00PM in conference room 325.