HI HB1180 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 181, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 181, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each chief procurement officer to coordinate with the administrator of the procurement office regarding procurement policies, innovations, and concerns. Requires the reporting of procurement contract data pursuant to the administrator of the procurement office. (HB1180 CD1)
Title
Procurement ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 181, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 181, on 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 4:15PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 4:15PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 4:15PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Ihara, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson Chair; Kobayashi, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 606) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1541) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:45PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 286). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 629) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |