HI HB1179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for annual adjustments to the Hawaii standard deduction, income tax rate brackets, and personal exemption in response to increases in inflation as documented by the U.S. Department of Labor Consumer Price Index. Requires DOTAX to submit a report to the legislature evaluating the adjustments made by the Act. Sunsets 1/1/2020. (HB1179 HD1)
Title
Income Tax; Inflation Adjustments; Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 285). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |