HI HB1174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1174
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDB, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDB, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from Department of Health rules to certain cottage food products sold directly to consumers under certain conditions. Requires the Department of Health to adopt rules no later than December 31, 2017. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
Relating To Cottage Foods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EDB, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1174 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDB, HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1174&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1174_.HTM |