HI HB1166 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for fiscal biennium 2013-2015 for public employees in collective bargaining unit (10) and for employees excluded from collective bargaining that are on the same compensation plan as those officers and employees within collective bargaining unit (10). Effective 07/01/50. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining; Cost Items; Salary Increases; Collective Bargaining Unit (10); Appropriations ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-19HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Takumi, Johanson.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 566) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-04-05SenateReported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateRe-Referred to JDL/WAM.
2013-03-05SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2013-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 124).
2013-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-05HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
2013-02-05HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-02-01HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2013-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback