HI HB1165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1165
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Center for Women in Technology within the University of Hawaii, Department of Information and Computer Sciences.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii And Women In Technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1165 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1165&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1165_.HTM |