HI HB1156 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1156
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the cap on the amount that may be claimed per qualified production. Removes the limit for the total amount of tax credits allowed per year for the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit.
Title
Relating To Film Credit Cap Removal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1156 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1156&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1156_.HTM |