HI HB1152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the period in which the supreme court and intermediate appellate court are in session to June 1 of each year through April 1 of the following year. Specifies that the Hawaii supreme court and intermediate appellate court shall issue decisions only during the time period these courts are in session. Requires a written decision to be issued during the same session in which the oral argument is heard.
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-28 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1152 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1152&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1152_.HTM |