HI HB1144 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution to provide victims of crime with specific rights related to the criminal justice process. (HB1144 HD1)
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Rights of Victims of Crime (ConAm)
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 495-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-02-04 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-09-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB679 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.