HI HB1144 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the development and use of programmatic safe harbor agreements and programmatic habitat conservation plans that cover multiple landowners or a class of landowners or extend over a wide area or region. (HB1144 HD1)
Title
Endangered Species
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-24 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2009-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-09 2:55 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to ENE, WTL. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Wooley voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 682) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Chong, Coffman, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Chang, Herkes, Luke, Morita, Sagum. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-02-09 10:15am in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB962 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.