HI HB1141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain rental motor vehicle lessors to expedite the incorporation of zero-emission vehicles into the lessor's fleet by July 1, 2030. Requires motor vehicle lessors to certify their compliance to the director of commerce and consumer affairs. Beginning 1/1/2022, establishes a rental motor vehicle emissions surcharge tax on certain rental motor vehicles with internal combustion engines. Offers a rebate to transient accommodations with at least fifty parking stalls if they install an alternating current Level two station with two or more ports or a direct current fast charging system. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Zero-emission Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1141 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Fleet
Lessors
Rental Motor Vehicles
Surcharge
Zero-Emission Vehicles
Fleet
Lessors
Rental Motor Vehicles
Surcharge
Zero-Emission Vehicles