HI HB1136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources, in conjunction with the counties, to develop an invasive species flood control plan to prevent, contain, and mitigate hazardous tree growth impacting streams and waterways. Requires submittal of the plan to the legislature prior to the 2022 regular session.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1136 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1136&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1136_.HTM |