HI HB1134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for equipment, supplies, and salaries for Hookele legal self-help service centers in Hilo and Kona.
Title
Judiciary; Third Circuit; Hookele; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Kawakami, Thielen. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1309 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1134&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1134_.HTM |