HI HB1133 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands authorization of the State Parks and Commercial Fisheries Special Funds and the Special Land and Development Fund to: (1) Allow for deposits of criminal and civil penalties, fines, and other administrative charges collected, and (2) Expend moneys for restoration or mitigation of natural or cultural resources, education and public outreach, and enforcement efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Funds; Department of Land and Natural Resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-01-30 (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2009-01-28 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2009-01-26 (H) Pending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB951 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback