HI HB1130 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the department to set re-inspection frequencies for renewal permits based on factors relevant to the safe operation of the equipment and in accordance with American Society of Mechanical Engineers standards; clarifies that in addition to asking questions relating to an investigation, enforcement and inspection activities, that the department may also obtain relevant records; housekeeping amendments for spelling and clarification. (HB1130, HD2)
Title
Boiler and Elevator Safety; Renewal Inspections; Housekeeping Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02/17/09 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 14 | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Takumi. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to LAB, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB948 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.