HI HB1125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the classification of certain special funds as trust funds and appropriates $ from the fund for disability benefits for automation of the Disability Compensation Division. (HB1125 HD2)
Title
Trust Funds; Automation of Disability Compensation Division
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 217). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Choy, Keith-Agaran, Sagum, Yamashita. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-09 12:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Takumi. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB943 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.