HI HB1120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a percentage of the annual purchasing expenditure of the State set-aside for small businesses be awarded to veteran-owned and service-disabled veteran-owned small businesses, in addition to any other preferences provided under the Procurement Code for such businesses.
Title
Procurement Code; Veteran-Owned and Service-Disabled Veteran-Owned Small Businesses; Set Aside
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Feki Pouha [R] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Tsuji, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno, Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-09-15 9:05AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to VMI, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1120&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1120_.HTM |