HI HB1117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits reimbursements for compounded prescription drugs to $1,000 in a thirty-day period. Limits reimbursements for any schedule II drug under chapter 329, Uniform Controlled Substances Act, Hawaii Revised Statues, dispensed by a physician to a one-time thirty-day supply upon the first visit.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-06 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-09-17 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB983 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
SB983 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1117&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1117_.HTM |