HI HB1113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals or reclassifies certain non-general funds administered by the department of human services as recommended by the auditor in auditor report no. 21-02.
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1113 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).