HI HB1110 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits courts from considering a person's federal veterans disability benefits in determining whether to award support and maintenance allowances or the amount of any such allowance to the person's spouse or former spouse. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1110 HD1)
Title
Spousal Support and Maintenance; Veterans Disability Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on PBM with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to PBM. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching, Pine. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-07-11 9:35AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS, PBM, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |