HI HB1104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the allowance for Oahu-based legislators conducting official business during certain recess and interim periods.
Title
Relating To Legislative Allowance.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1104 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1104&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1104_.HTM |