HI HB1104 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State and counties to purchase an unspecified percentage of fuel cell electric vehicles (FCEV) in their total annual purchase or acquisition of government motor vehicles. Requires the directors of finance to track and report to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism (DBEDT) the number of FCEV registered in the State. Requires fuel distributors to report to DBEDT the volume of non-fossil fuels imported or produced for ultimate sale or consumption in the State.
Title
Energy; Fuel Cell Electric Vehicles; Non-fossil Fuels ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1104&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1104_.HTM |