HI HB1102 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 266-19.5(d), Hawaii Revised Statutes, for the purpose of increasing the total contract value and total aggregate value of capital advancement contracts entered into by the Department of Transportation for harbor improvements and adds reporting requirements for the department.
Title
Relating To Capital Advancement Contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1400 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1102 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1102 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1102&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1102_.HTM |