HI HB1098 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Places a twenty-four-month limit on general assistance to households without minor dependents with appropriate exceptions. Requires DHS to refer general assistance recipients to the aid to the aged, blind, and disabled program under specified conditions. Converts general assistance into an entitlement program. Takes effect 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
General Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 5:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-05-01 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 12:30pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-09 10:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04/30/09 9:00 AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04/29/09 11:00 AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-09 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-24-09 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-21-09 3:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 589). | |
2009-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-17 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Brower Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 567). | |
2009-04-16 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-27 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-20-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-09 2:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 216). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Manahan, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 3-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Awana, Nishimoto. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-09 2:30 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-09 8:00am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB916 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.