HI HB1092 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the deduction for state taxes paid inoperative for corporate taxpayers and: (1) An individual filer with federal adjusted gross income of $70,000 or more; (2) A head of household with federal adjusted gross income of $105,000 or more; and (3) A joint or surviving spouse filer with federal adjusted gross income of $140,000 or more. Effective 7/1/2117 and applicable to taxpayer years beginning after 12/31/2010. (SD3)
Title
Taxation; Tax Improvement
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 747). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 548). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:15PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 3:15PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 2:15PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-11 2:15PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 671). | |
2011-04-21 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 574). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603) in amended form (SD 3). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green, Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Kim, Taniguchi, Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report filed. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Separated Committee Report. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1239) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Ige, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai ; 4 No(es): Chun Oakland, Kim, Ryan, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 986) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-23-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-22-11 10:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 8:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 260). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Ichiyama, McKelvey, Takai, Wooley, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Ching, Cullen, Fontaine, Hashem, Johanson, Marumoto, Nishimoto, Pine, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting no (13) and Representative(s) Morita excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Pine, Riviere, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 681) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Coffman, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, C. Lee. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The votes in FIN were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, C. Lee. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 03-01-11. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-28-11. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Proposed drafts of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 1:30 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1319 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.