HI HB1081 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the Department of Land and Natural Resources with flexibility in developing industrial parks in order to address the growing demand in the State for available industrial lands. (HB1081 HD1)
Title
Industrial Parks; Public Lands
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ERB with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla excused (1). | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ERB. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Chong, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Herkes. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 01-31-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to WLO, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1313 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.