HI HB1069 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - (S) Act 053, 5/19/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - (S) Act 053, 5/19/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes specific time frames for a commitment or release on conditions when unfit defendants are charged with petty misdemeanors for sixty days, and non-violent misdemeanors for one hundred twenty days. (SD1)
Title
Effect of Finding of Unfitness to Proceed
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | (S) Act 053, 5/19/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155). | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Act 053, on 5/18/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 658). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, C. Lee excused (2). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 654). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 8:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 247). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Ichiyama, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Morita. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-03-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1296 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to JDL.