HI HB1060 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1060
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the felony offense of persistent nonsupport in the first degree when a person knowingly and persistently fails to provide support to a child, spouse, or other dependent to whom the person has a legal obligation of support for five years or longer, or is $30,000 or more in arrears.
Title
Relating To Persistent Nonsupport.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB733 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB733 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1060&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1060_.HTM |