HI HB106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a permitting process for geothermal resources development within agricultural, rural, and urban districts. Establishes application requirements for geothermal resources development within conservation districts. Effective 07/01/2020. (HD2)
Title
Geothermal Resources Development; Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to ENE/WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 172). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Thielen. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 10:30AM. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-11-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-13 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-13. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |