HI HB1057 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1057
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the law relating to exemption for vehicles designated as vehicles used by farmers as set forth in section 286-208, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Motor Carriers.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1057 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2
SB1211 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
SB1211 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1057&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1057_.HTM |