HI HB1047 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1047
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any general excise tax license be renewed biennially. Permits the department of taxation to charge a fee for biennial renewals and requires biennial renewals be applied for electronically. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 340) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-10-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1047 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
SB1201 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1201 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.