HI HB1045 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Act 168, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Act 168, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a minor student's parent or legal guardian, rather than the student, to produce the required student records when transferring schools. Clarifies that emancipated minors may produce the required student records when transferring schools. Clarifies that the transfer process is the same whether a transfer is within the same complex area or to another complex area. Exempts students eligible for assistance provided under the federal McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act of 1987 from producing required student records when transferring schools. Effective 1/1/2024. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Senate | Act 168, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271). |
2023-07-03 | House | Act 168, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 51). |
2023-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 51) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Tarnas, La Chica, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 3:20PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Tarnas Co-Chairs; La Chica, Marten, Garcia. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2023-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 555) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-23. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-21-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1139) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Fevella. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 3:25PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 332) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1343 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.