HI HB1045 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an applicant or recipient of public assistance to be a resident of the State for at least 4 months.
Title
Public Assistance; Residency Requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1249 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to HSH/CPN, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1045&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1045_.HTM |