HI HB1045 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to pay student employees at new or expanded worksites and for the hiring of 3.0 FTE for the University of Hawaii vice chancellor for students for the coordination, recruitment, training, and compliance with system-wide procedures and student employment regulations.
Title
University of Hawaii; Appropriation; Student Employees ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1045&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1045_.HTM |