HI HB1037 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that government entities are only liable in certain cases for the percentage share of the damages they actually caused. (HB1037 HD2)
Title
Government Tort Liability
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 196). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Berg, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Luke, Nishimoto, Rhoads, Saiki voting no (8) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Keith-Agaran; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-09 11:00am in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Cabanilla, Herkes, McKelvey, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Luke; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-10-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Wakai excused (3). | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, M. Lee, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Rhoads, Takumi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Saiki; and Excused: none. | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-02-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB855 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.