HI HB1032 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 233, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 233, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Controlled Substances Act, chapter 329, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to make it consistent with amendments in the federal controlled substances law as required by section 329-11, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 233, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361). |
2021-07-07 | House | Act 233, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1361). |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 639). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 277). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1186 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.