HI HB1011 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to issue new ocean recreation commercial permits by public auction.
Title
Relating To Ocean Recreation Commercial Permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1165 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1011 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB1011 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1011&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1011_.HTM |