HI HB100 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning 7/1/2022, establishes an air cargo pest inspection, quarantine, and eradication fee, to be assessed on each air carrier delivering air cargo into the State. Establishes the air cargo pest inspection, quarantine, and eradication fund, to be used solely by the department of agriculture's air cargo inspection program. Increases the inspection, quarantine, and eradication service fee and charge from 75 cents to an unspecified amount for every 1,000 pounds of freight or part thereof brought into the State. Requires the auditor to conduct an analysis on the air cargo pest inspection, quarantine, and eradication fee. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Inspection Fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB491 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback