GA SR84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for pari-mutuel betting on horse racing; to provide for the disposition of licensing and taxation revenues from such activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly; pari-mutuel betting on horse racing; provide by law- CA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-05SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback