GA SR822 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Department of Transportation to seek a waiver from the Federal Highway Administration in order to allow retail developments in rest areas along the interstate highway system; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation, Dept. of; urged to seek waiver from Federal Highway Administration to allow retail developments along interstate highway
Sponsors
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Sen. Eugene Pearson [R] |
Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #539 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Read and Referred |