GA SR791 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION supporting the creation of a state veterans cemetery in Augusta-Richmond County, Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
State of Georgia; creation of a state veterans cemetery in Augusta-Richmond County, Georgia; support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57622 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190617 |