GA SR766 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to adopt and to submit to the states a balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution and to balance our current budget; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Congress; urged to adopt/submit to states a balanced budget amendment to U.S. Constitution and balance current budget
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #611 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #611 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred |