GA SR70 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Congress to adopt and to submit to the states a balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution and to balance our current budget; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Congress; urged to adopt/submit to the states a balanced budget amendment to the U.S. Constitution
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #512 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |