GA SR623 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the Department of Natural Resources, Department of Economic Development, and Department of Community Affairs to cooperate in crafting strategies to promote outdoor recreation in the State of Georgia and establish Georgia as a top destination for outdoor recreation; and for other purposes.
Title
Dept. of Natural Resources, Dept. of Economic Dev., and Dept. of Community Affairs; cooperate in crafting strategies to promote outdoor recreation; encourage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67122 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224301 |