GA SR538 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION condemning the Congress of the United States for pursuing impeachment proceedings against President Donald J. Trump; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Congress; pursuing impeachment proceedings against President Donald J. Trump; condemn
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |