GA SR474 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on February 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on February 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging partnership among the Office of the Child Advocate for the Protection of Children, the Division of Family and Children Services of the Department of Human Services, and the boards of commissioners for all Georgia counties to promote the provision of quality legal representation for parents, children and youth, and child welfare agencies at all stages of child welfare proceedings; and for other purposes.
Title
Office of the Child Advocate for the Protection of Children; quality legal representation for parents, children and youth, and child welfare agencies at all stages of child welfare proceedings; urge partnership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #537 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |